DC CER24-0131 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-18 - Resolution ACR24-0128, Effective from Feb 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001299
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-18 - Resolution ACR24-0128, Effective from Feb 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001299
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. King’s Celebration of Excellence featuring Howard University vs. the University of Notre Dame Men’s Basketball Recognition Resolution of 2022
Title
Dr. King’s Celebration of Excellence featuring Howard University vs. the University of Notre Dame Men’s Basketball Recognition Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0128, Effective from Feb 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001299 |
2022-02-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0128 |
2022-02-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-02-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |