DC CER24-0122 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-28 - Resolution ACR24-0119, Effective from Jan 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000668
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Evelyn Naomi Spriggs Ford 100th Birthday Recognition Resolution of 2022

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Evelyn Naomi Spriggs Ford 100th Birthday Recognition Resolution of 2022

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-28CouncilResolution ACR24-0119, Effective from Jan 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000668
2022-01-04CouncilApproved with Resolution Number ACR24-0119
2022-01-04CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2022-01-04CouncilRetained by the Council
2022-01-03CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback