DC CER24-0121 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-28 - Resolution ACR24-0118, Effective from Dec 21, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 000666
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reverend Michael Wilker Recognition Resolution of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reverend Michael Wilker Recognition Resolution of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-28CouncilResolution ACR24-0118, Effective from Dec 21, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 000666
2021-12-21CouncilApproved with Resolution Number ACR24-0118
2021-12-21CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2021-12-21CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-12-17CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback