DC CER24-0096 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-05 - Resolution ACR24-0094, Effective from Oct 19, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 011698
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-05 - Resolution ACR24-0094, Effective from Oct 19, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 011698
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Housing Cooperative Month Recognition Resolution of 2021
Title
National Housing Cooperative Month Recognition Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-05 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0094, Effective from Oct 19, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 011698 |
2021-10-19 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0094 |
2021-10-19 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-10-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-10-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |