DC CER24-0091 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-05 - Resolution ACR24-0089, Effective from Oct 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 011687
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-05 - Resolution ACR24-0089, Effective from Oct 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 011687
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Liveaboard Boater Day Recognition Resolution of 2021
Title
Liveaboard Boater Day Recognition Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-05 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0089, Effective from Oct 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 011687 |
2021-10-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0089 |
2021-10-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-10-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-10-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |