DC CER24-0044 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Resolution ACR24-0044, Effective from May 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Resolution ACR24-0044, Effective from May 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elgin Gay Baylor Posthumous Memorial Recognition Resolution of 2021
Title
Elgin Gay Baylor Posthumous Memorial Recognition Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0044, Effective from May 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005629 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0044 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-05-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-05-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |