DC CER24-0037 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Resolution ACR24-0037, Effective from May 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005614
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Resolution ACR24-0037, Effective from May 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005614
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Immigrant Day of Resilience Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2021
Title
Immigrant Day of Resilience Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0037, Effective from May 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005614 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0037 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-05-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-04-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |