DC CER24-0023 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Resolution ACR24-0023, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Resolution ACR24-0023, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Christine Warnke Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2021
Title
Dr. Christine Warnke Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0023, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005168 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0023 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-04-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-03-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |