DC CER24-0021 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Resolution ACR24-0021, Effective from Mar 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Resolution ACR24-0021, Effective from Mar 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ayanna Andrews Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2021
Title
Ayanna Andrews Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0021, Effective from Mar 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005163 |
2021-03-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0021 |
2021-03-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-03-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-03-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |