DC CER24-0002 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - Resolution ACR24-0002, Effective from Jan 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - Resolution ACR24-0002, Effective from Jan 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
John F. Tatum, Sr. Washington, D.C. Hall of Fame Induction Recognition Resolution of 2021
Title
John F. Tatum, Sr. Washington, D.C. Hall of Fame Induction Recognition Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0002, Effective from Jan 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001544 |
2021-01-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0002 |
2021-01-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-01-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |