DC CER23-0312 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Resolution ACR23-0311, Effective from Dec 18, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14655
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Resolution ACR23-0311, Effective from Dec 18, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14655
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Loretta Neumann Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2020
Title
Loretta Neumann Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0311, Effective from Dec 18, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14655 |
2020-12-18 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0311 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-10-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |