DC CER23-0245 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - Resolution ACR23-0245, Effective from Apr 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4482
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - Resolution ACR23-0245, Effective from Apr 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4482
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sexual Assault Awareness Month Recognition Resolution of 2020
Title
Sexual Assault Awareness Month Recognition Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0245, Effective from Apr 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4482 |
2020-04-24 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0245 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-03-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-02-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |