DC CER23-0010 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Resolution ACR23-0010, Effective from Feb 15, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2091
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Resolution ACR23-0010, Effective from Feb 15, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2091
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bus to Work Day Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
Bus to Work Day Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0010, Effective from Feb 15, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2091 |
2019-02-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0010 |
2019-02-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-02-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-01-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |