DC CER22-0445 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Resolution ACR22-0445 Effective from December 28, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13936
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

International Day To End Violence Against Sex Workers Recognition Resolution Of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

International Day To End Violence Against Sex Workers Recognition Resolution Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28CouncilResolution ACR22-0445 Effective from December 28, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13936
2018-12-28CouncilApproved with Resolution Number ACR22-0445
2018-12-04CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-12-04CouncilRetained by the Council
2018-11-29CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback