DC CER22-0392 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-02 - Resolution ACR22-0392 Effective from November 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-02 - Resolution ACR22-0392 Effective from November 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mamie Johnson Little League D.c. State Little League Championship Team Recognition Resolution Of 2018
Title
Mamie Johnson Little League D.c. State Little League Championship Team Recognition Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-02 | Council | Resolution ACR22-0392 Effective from November 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12112 |
2018-11-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR22-0392 |
2018-09-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-09-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-09-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |