DC CER22-0309 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Resolution ACR22-0309 Effective from August 24, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8729
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Resolution ACR22-0309 Effective from August 24, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8729
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Katherine S. Broderick Recognition Resolution Of 2018
Title
Katherine S. Broderick Recognition Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Council | Resolution ACR22-0309 Effective from August 24, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8729 |
2018-08-24 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR22-0309 |
2018-04-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-04-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-04-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |