DC CER22-0286 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Resolution ACR22-0286 Effective from August 24, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8682
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Greater Washington 10th Anniversary Ceremonial Recognition Resolution Of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Greater Washington 10th Anniversary Ceremonial Recognition Resolution Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24CouncilResolution ACR22-0286 Effective from August 24, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8682
2018-08-24CouncilApproved with Resolution Number ACR22-0286
2018-04-10CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-04-10CouncilRetained by the Council
2018-03-14CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback