DC CER22-0258 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Resolution ACR22-0258 Effective from February 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3559
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Lutheran Social Services Of The National Capital Area 100th Anniversary Ceremonial Recognition Resolution Of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lutheran Social Services Of The National Capital Area 100th Anniversary Ceremonial Recognition Resolution Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06CouncilResolution ACR22-0258 Effective from February 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3559
2018-02-06CouncilApproved with Resolution Number ACR22-0258
2018-02-06CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-02-06CouncilRetained by the Council
2018-02-05CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback