DC CER22-0232 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on February 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Resolution ACR22-0232 Effective from February 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on February 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Resolution ACR22-0232 Effective from February 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Poet Laurate Dolores Kendrick Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Title
Poet Laurate Dolores Kendrick Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Council | Resolution ACR22-0232 Effective from February 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 860 |
2018-02-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR22-0232 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-12-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-11-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |