DC CER22-0222 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Resolution ACR22-0222 Effective from April 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Resolution ACR22-0222 Effective from April 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lucille Virginia Robinson Grimes 100th Birthday Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Title
Lucille Virginia Robinson Grimes 100th Birthday Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Council | Resolution ACR22-0222 Effective from April 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3544 |
2018-04-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR22-0222 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-11-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-11-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |