DC CER22-0176 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Resolution ACR22-0176 Effective from October 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10963
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Resolution ACR22-0176 Effective from October 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10963
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tony And Joe's Seafood Place Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Title
Tony And Joe's Seafood Place Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-10-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-27 | Council | Resolution ACR22-0176 Effective from October 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10963 |
2017-10-27 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR22-0176 |
2017-10-03 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-10-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |