DC CER22-0169 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Resolution ACR22-0169 Effective from October 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10950
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Resolution ACR22-0169 Effective from October 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10950
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Frank Smith, Jr. Ceremonial Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Title
Dr. Frank Smith, Jr. Ceremonial Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-27 | Council | Resolution ACR22-0169 Effective from October 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10950 |
2017-10-27 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR22-0169 |
2017-10-03 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-10-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-10-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |