DC CER22-0113 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Resolution ACR22-0113 Effective from August 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7802
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Resolution ACR22-0113 Effective from August 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7802
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joy Holland Retirement Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Title
Joy Holland Retirement Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | Council | Resolution ACR22-0113 Effective from August 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7802 |
2017-08-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR22-0113 |
2017-06-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-06-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-05-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |