DC B25-0892 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Act A25-0545 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009975, Expires on Oct 24, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Act A25-0545 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009975, Expires on Oct 24, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Housing Authority Stabilization and Reform Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Title
District of Columbia Housing Authority Stabilization and Reform Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | Council | Act A25-0545 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009975, Expires on Oct 24, 2024 |
2024-07-31 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-07-26 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0545, Expires on Oct 24, 2024 |
2024-07-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 2, 2024 |
2024-07-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-07-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-07-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |