DC B25-0785 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-18 - Law Number L25-0218 Effective from Sep 18, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-18 - Law Number L25-0218 Effective from Sep 18, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2025 Local Budget Act of 2024
Title
Fiscal Year 2025 Local Budget Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - Amendment (Pinto) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - Amendment (RWhite #2) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - Amendment (RWhite) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - Amendment (Pinto) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - Amendment (RWhite #2) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - Amendment (RWhite) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-18 | Council | Law Number L25-0218 Effective from Sep 18, 2024 |
2024-08-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2024-07-19 | Council | Act A25-0501 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 008366 |
2024-07-16 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-07-15 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0501 |
2024-07-11 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-07-08 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-07-08 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-07-05 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-07-01 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 16, 2024 |
2024-06-12 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-06-12 | Council | Amendment (Pinto) |
2024-06-12 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau) |
2024-06-12 | Council | Amendment (Allen) |
2024-06-12 | Council | Amendment (RWhite #2) |
2024-06-12 | Council | Amendment (RWhite) |
2024-06-12 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2024-06-10 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-06-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-05-29 | Council | Amendment (Frumin) |
2024-05-29 | Council | First Reading |
2024-05-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-05-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-05-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0785 |
2024-05-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0785 |
2024-05-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0785 |
2024-05-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0785 |
2024-05-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0785 |
2024-05-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0785 |
2024-05-08 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0785 |
2024-05-08 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0785 |
2024-05-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-04-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0785 Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
2024-02-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |