DC B25-0777 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Act A25-0448 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004642, Expires on Jul 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Act A25-0448 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004642, Expires on Jul 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Annie's Way Designation Emergency Act of 2024
Title
Annie's Way Designation Emergency Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Council | Act A25-0448 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004642, Expires on Jul 14, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-04-15 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0448, Expires on Jul 14, 2024 |
2024-04-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 23, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |