DC B25-0679 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Law L25-0165, Effective from May 21, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006669, Expires on Jan 01, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Law L25-0165, Effective from May 21, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006669, Expires on Jan 01, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Cannabis License Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Medical Cannabis License Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Council | Law L25-0165, Effective from May 21, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006669, Expires on Jan 01, 2025 |
2024-04-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2024-03-29 | Council | Act A25-0416 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003500 |
2024-03-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-03-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0416 |
2024-03-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 25, 2024 |
2024-03-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-02-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0679 Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-06 | Council | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-02-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |