DC B25-0667 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-29 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-29 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DC Health Care Alliance Financial Eligibility Rulemaking Approval Emergency Act of 2024
Title
DC Health Care Alliance Financial Eligibility Rulemaking Approval Emergency Act of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Council | Withdrawn |
2024-02-06 | Council | WITHDRAWN (Henderson) |
2024-01-23 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-01-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0667 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54609/Introduction/B25-0667-Introduction.pdf |