DC B25-0566 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 25-566 would require the Board of Professional Counseling to regulate the practice and licensure of behavioral analysts in the District. It would also make licensure a requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral Analyst Licensure Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-07CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2023-11-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-11-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B25-0566 Published in the DC Register
2023-11-08CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-11-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2023-11-06CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback