DC B25-0527 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-03 - Act A25-0295 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 014524, Expires on Jan 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

CJCC Data Collection Technical Correction Emergency Amendment Act of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CJCC Data Collection Technical Correction Emergency Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-10-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-03CouncilAct A25-0295 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 014524, Expires on Jan 29, 2024
2023-10-31CouncilReturned from Mayor
2023-10-31CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0295, Expires on Jan 29, 2024
2023-10-17CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2023
2023-10-03CouncilFinal Reading
2023-10-03CouncilRetained by the Council
2023-10-02CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback