DC B25-0508 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-20 - Act A25-0256 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013847, Expires on Jan 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law Enforcement Vehicular Pursuit Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Enforcement Vehicular Pursuit Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-10-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-20CouncilAct A25-0256 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013847, Expires on Jan 14, 2024
2023-10-17CouncilReturned from Mayor
2023-10-16CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0256, Expires on Jan 14, 2024
2023-10-11CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 25, 2023
2023-10-03CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2023-10-03CouncilRetained by the Council
2023-10-02CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback