DC B25-0484 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-484 would create a civil cause of action for victims of unauthorized disclosure of private, intimate images and provide for damages. It would also authorize the Superior Court to grant the victim attorney’s fees and other relief.
Title
Uniform Civil Remedies for Unauthorized Disclosure of Intimate Images Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-09-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0484 Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0484 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/53885/Introduction/B25-0484-Introduction.pdf |