DC B25-0409 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Act A25-0213 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010782, Expires on Oct 29, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Act A25-0213 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010782, Expires on Oct 29, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. CW106027 with Voyager Trucking Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023
Title
Contract No. CW106027 with Voyager Trucking Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-11 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | Council | Act A25-0213 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010782, Expires on Oct 29, 2023 |
2023-08-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-07-31 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0213, Expires on Oct 29, 2023 |
2023-07-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 3, 2023 |
2023-07-11 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-07-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-07-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |