DC B25-0400 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-20 - Act A25-0218 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013732, Expires on Jan 04, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-20 - Act A25-0218 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013732, Expires on Jan 04, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. CW101161 with Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023
Title
Contract No. CW101161 with Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-20 | Council | Act A25-0218 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013732, Expires on Jan 04, 2024 |
2023-10-10 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-10-06 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0218, Expires on Jan 04, 2024 |
2023-09-26 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 11, 2023 |
2023-09-19 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-07-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-06-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |