DC B25-0374 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Act A25-0198 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010746, Expires on Oct 25, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Office of Unified Communications Transparency and Accuracy Emergency Amendment Act of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Unified Communications Transparency and Accuracy Emergency Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-07-11 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-04CouncilAct A25-0198 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010746, Expires on Oct 25, 2023
2023-08-01CouncilReturned from Mayor
2023-07-27CouncilEnacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0198, Expires on Oct 25, 2023
2023-07-18CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 1, 2023
2023-07-11CouncilFinal Reading
2023-07-11CouncilRetained by the Council
2023-07-10CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback