DC B25-0355 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-15 - Law L25-0085, Effective from Dec 01, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015723, Expires on Jul 13, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Floodplain Review Authority Temporary Amendment Act of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Floodplain Review Authority Temporary Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-15CouncilLaw L25-0085, Effective from Dec 01, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015723, Expires on Jul 13, 2024
2023-10-20CouncilAct A25-0255 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013845
2023-10-18CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2023-10-17CouncilReturned from Mayor
2023-10-16CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0255
2023-10-04CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 19, 2023
2023-09-19CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2023-07-14CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B25-0355 Published in the DC Register
2023-07-11CouncilFirst Reading
2023-07-11CouncilRetained by the Council
2023-06-29CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback