DC B25-0332 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-06 - Law L25-0053, Effective from Sep 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013064, Expires on Apr 28, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Virtual Open Meetings Authority Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virtual Open Meetings Authority Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-07-11 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-06CouncilLaw L25-0053, Effective from Sep 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013064, Expires on Apr 28, 2024
2023-08-04CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2023-08-04CouncilAct A25-0180 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010696
2023-08-01CouncilReturned from Mayor
2023-07-31CouncilEnacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0180
2023-07-24CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 7, 2023
2023-07-11CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2023-06-30CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B25-0332 Published in the DC Register
2023-06-20CouncilFirst Reading
2023-06-20CouncilRetained by the Council
2023-06-15CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback