DC B25-0290 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-05 - Law L25-0091, Effective from Dec 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000006
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, Bill 25-290 would establish a Minimum Wage Board, define its powers and duties, and provide for the fixing of minimum wages for workers particularly women and minor workers. It also clarifies the definition of employer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial Safety Act Clarification Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-10-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-05CouncilLaw L25-0091, Effective from Dec 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000006
2023-11-06CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2023-11-03CouncilAct A25-0287 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 014506
2023-10-31CouncilReturned from Mayor
2023-10-30CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0287
2023-10-19CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 2, 2023
2023-10-03CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2023-09-27CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2023-09-19CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2023-09-19CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B25-0290
2023-07-13CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2023-06-23CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-06-16CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-05-19CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B25-0290 Published in the DC Register
2023-05-16CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2023-05-12CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback