DC B25-0286 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 25-286 would authorize the Mayor to execute an Occupational Therapy Interjurisdictional Compact for the purpose of increasing access to in-person practice of occupational therapy. It would create requirements for home state licensure and education and training for participating compact occupational therapists. It would also establish requirements for states to conduct and report adverse actions and require all compact states to share licensee information with other compact states. It creates a coordinated database on participating compact occupational therapists and establishes the Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Commission.
Title
Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Approval Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-11-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-11-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0286 Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2023-05-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0286 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52987/Introduction/B25-0286-Introduction.pdf |