DC B25-0255 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-29 - Law L25-0041, Effective from Aug 17, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 012874, Expires on Mar 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-29 - Law L25-0041, Effective from Aug 17, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 012874, Expires on Mar 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Technical Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Technical Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-29 | Council | Law L25-0041, Effective from Aug 17, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 012874, Expires on Mar 29, 2024 |
2023-07-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-06-30 | Council | Act A25-0132 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009042 |
2023-06-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-06-27 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0132 |
2023-06-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 29, 2023 |
2023-06-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-05-16 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-05-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0255 Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-02 | Council | First Reading |
2023-05-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |