DC B25-0244 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Law L25-0125, Effective from Feb 15, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001850
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prescription Drug Monitoring Program Amendment Act of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Monitoring Program Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-12-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-23CouncilLaw L25-0125, Effective from Feb 15, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001850
2024-01-03CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2023-12-29CouncilAct A25-0333 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016582
2023-12-22CouncilReturned from Mayor
2023-12-21CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0333
2023-12-08CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2023
2023-12-05CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2023-11-07CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2023-10-12CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2023-10-10CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B25-0244
2023-09-11CouncilNotice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
2023-07-06CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2023-06-16CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-06-07CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-05-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2023-04-21CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B25-0244 Published in the DC Register
2023-04-11CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback