DC B25-0243 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Child and Family Services Agency Investigation Completion Amendment Act of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child and Family Services Agency Investigation Completion Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-02CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2023-10-13CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-10-05CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-09-28CouncilPublic Hearing Cancelled
2023-09-21CouncilCancellation Notice of Public Hearing Filed
2023-08-11CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-08-07CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-05-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Facilities and Family Services
2023-04-21CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B25-0243 Published in the DC Register
2023-04-11CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback