DC B25-0226 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Law L25-0124, Effective from Feb 15, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001849
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 25-226 would authorize employees and agents of public schools who have been certified under an Office of the State Superintendent of Education administration training program to administer undesignated albuterol to a student who is suffering from an asthma attack and undesignated glucagon to a student who is suffering from hypoglycemia due to diabetes. FUNDING NOTE - This bill is passed Subject to Appropriations. Please see Fiscal Impact Statement for more information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to Emergency Albuterol and Glucagon Amendment Act of 2023 (now known as "Access to Emergency Medications Amendment Act of 2023")

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-12-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-23CouncilLaw L25-0124, Effective from Feb 15, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001849
2024-01-03CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2023-12-29CouncilAct A25-0332 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016578
2023-12-22CouncilReturned from Mayor
2023-12-21CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0332
2023-12-08CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2023
2023-12-05CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2023-11-07CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2023-10-12CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2023-10-10CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B25-0226
2023-09-11CouncilNotice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
2023-07-13CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2023-07-13CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2023-06-16CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-06-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-06-07CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-04-07CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B25-0226 Published in the DC Register
2023-03-21CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2023-03-20CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback