DC B25-0208 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Law L25-0030, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010348, Expires on Mar 01, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Historic Preservation of Derelict District Properties Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historic Preservation of Derelict District Properties Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-28CouncilLaw L25-0030, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010348, Expires on Mar 01, 2024
2023-06-05CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2023-06-02CouncilAct A25-0106 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 007922
2023-05-25CouncilReturned from Mayor
2023-05-24CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0106
2023-05-11CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2023
2023-05-02CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2023-04-07CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B25-0208 Published in the DC Register
2023-04-04CouncilFirst Reading
2023-04-04CouncilRetained by the Council
2023-03-31CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback