DC B25-0192 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-07-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-07-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-192 would establish a program operated by DC Water and the Department of Energy and Environment to require the removal of lead service lines from public property and from all District government buildings and privately owned properties by January 1, 2030. DC Water must maintain an inventory of water service lines and identify those that are lead service lines. It also provides a tax credit to property owners who voluntarily replace lead service lines from private property through 2025. It requires reporting on program implementation plans and establishes a lead service line job training program at the DC Infrastructure Academy. It establishes training and development guidelines. Workers who work at least 2 hours a work week must be paid minimum wage and it also requires paid sick leave for students enrolled in a District-administered paid job training program.
Title
Green New Deal for a Lead-Free DC Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Zachary Parker [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Matthew Frumin [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0192 Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2023-03-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0192 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52463/Introduction/B25-0192-Introduction.pdf |