DC B25-0175 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-07-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-07-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-175 would symbolically designate the 800 Blocks of 26th Street, N.E., in Ward 5, as John Mercer Langston Way.
Title
John Mercer Langston Way Designation Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-23 | Council | Withdrawn |
2023-06-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0175 Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0175 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52442/Introduction/B25-0175-Introduction.pdf |