DC B25-0148 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Law L25-0027, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010345, Expires on Mar 01, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Law L25-0027, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010345, Expires on Mar 01, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Vehicle and Homeowner Insurance Prior Approval Rate Filing Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Motor Vehicle and Homeowner Insurance Prior Approval Rate Filing Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-02 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Council - CM McDuffie Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-02 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Council - CM McDuffie Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | Council | Law L25-0027, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010345, Expires on Mar 01, 2024 |
2023-06-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-06-02 | Council | Act A25-0104 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 007916 |
2023-05-25 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-05-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0104 |
2023-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-05-02 | Council | Amendment (McDuffie) |
2023-04-04 | Council | Postponed to May 2nd Legislative Meeting |
2023-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0148 Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-07 | Council | First Reading |
2023-03-07 | Council | CM McDuffie Amendment |
2023-03-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-02-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |