DC B25-0131 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 16 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-31 - Act A25-0689 Published in DC Register Vol 72 and Page 000720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 25-131 establishes requirements for private collection properties, including that they provide at least 32 gallons of solid waste container space per residential unit and collection services twice per week at a minimum. It would also add a civil penalty or fine for repeat violations. FISCAL NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement for more information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Containing Litter and Ensuring Adequate Neighborhood (CLEAN) Collections Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-12-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-12-03 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-12-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-31CouncilAct A25-0689 Published in DC Register Vol 72 and Page 000720
2025-01-22CouncilReturned from Mayor
2025-01-16CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0689
2025-01-08CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 23, 2025
2024-12-17CouncilFinal Reading
2024-12-17CouncilAmendment (Nadeau)
2024-12-03CouncilAmendment (Nadeau)
2024-12-03CouncilFirst Reading
2024-11-26CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2024-11-25CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B25-0131
2024-11-22CouncilNotice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
2024-02-23CouncilReferred to Committee on Public Works and Operations
2024-02-20CouncilReferred to Committee on Public Works and Operations
2023-02-24CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B25-0131 Published in the DC Register
2023-02-21CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2023-02-08CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback