DC B25-0124 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-28 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Feb 01, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-28 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Feb 01, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 25-124 would regulate the practice of health insurers that require patients and their medical providers to seek prior authorization for certain medications, medical procedures, or other medical care. It would set explicit timelines for insurers to respond to prior authorization requests and appeals and establishes what qualifications personnel must have to make these determinations. It would also clarify how insurers are to make information on prior authorization determinations available to patients and their medical providers. It would also prohibit insurers from requiring prior authorization for a treatment based solely on cost and require employers to provide timely notice to employees of medications and treatments covered under their insurer’s standard health benefit plan.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is passed Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement (FIS) for more information.
Title
Prior Authorization Reform Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-11-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-28 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Feb 01, 2024 |
2023-11-24 | Council | Act A25-0301 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015238 |
2023-11-20 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-11-15 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0301 |
2023-11-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 28, 2023 |
2023-11-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-10-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-09-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-09-26 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0124 |
2023-09-11 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-06-29 | Council | Notice of Mark-up Cancellation filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-06-15 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-05-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-04-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2023-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2023-02-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2023-02-17 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0124 Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |