DC B25-0120 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Act A25-0047 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 003005, Expires on May 28, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Act A25-0047 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 003005, Expires on May 28, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
River East at Grandview Condominium Property Tax Exemption Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Title
River East at Grandview Condominium Property Tax Exemption Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Council | Act A25-0047 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 003005, Expires on May 28, 2023 |
2023-02-28 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-02-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0047, Expires on May 28, 2023 |
2023-02-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-02-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-02-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |